IMPRESS YOUR PARENTS

Multiplying a number by 11 is incredibly easy -

astonish your parents and friends with this.

To multiply any 2-figure number by 11 we just put

the total of the two figures between the 2 figures.

**26 x 11 = 286**

Notice that the outer figures in 286 are the 26

being multiplied.

And the middle figure is just 2 and 6 added up.**So 72 x 11 = 792**

Question Comment !

Tutorial Title | |

Question Title | |

No Questions | 0 |

Questions Asked | 0 |

Skipped Questions | 0 |

Correctly Answered | 0 |

Wrongly Answered | 0 |

Total Question Attempts | 0 |

Current Question Attempts | 0 |

Skip Question

Reset Test

Halt Test

No Questions | 0 |

Questions Asked | 0 |

Skipped Questions | 0 |

Correctly Answered | 0 |

Wrongly Answered | 0 |

Total Question Attempts | 0 |

Time Taken

Close

Impress Your Parents (1)

**77 x 11 = 847**

This involves a carry figure because 7 + 7 = 14

we get 77 x 11 = 7_{1}47 = 847.

Impress Your Parents (2)

**234 x 11 = 2574**

We put the 2 and the 4 at the ends.

We add the first pair 2 + 3 = 5.

and we add the last pair: 3 + 4 = 7.

Impress Your Parents (3)